blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1111386

EP1111386 - Test strip for the assay of an analyte in a liquid sample [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
[2014/38]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Corey, Paul F.
1535 Springbrook Drive
Elkhart, Indiana 46514 / US
02 / Pugia, Michael J.
14342 Taddington Drive
Granger, Indiana 46530 / US
03 / Rehm, Gary E.
51871 Stoney Creek Drive
Elkhart, Indiana 46514 / US
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Peukert, Christof David
Siemens AG, CT IP
Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
80200 München / DE
[2014/14]
Former [2008/36]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte
Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/20]Linhart, Angela
Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2008/15]Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte GbR
Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/28]Linhart, Angela, et al
Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2001/26]Burkert, Frank, et al
Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date00126414.205.12.2000
[2001/26]
Priority number, dateUS1999046663717.12.1999         Original published format: US 466637
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1111386
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1111386
Date:18.12.2002
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1111386
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1111386
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/558, G01N33/52, G01N33/72, G01N33/84
[2001/26]
CPC:
G01N33/521 (EP,US); Y10T436/173076 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/26]
TitleGerman:Teststreifen zur Bestimmung eines Analyts in eine flüssige Probe[2001/26]
English:Test strip for the assay of an analyte in a liquid sample[2001/26]
French:Bande de test pour l'essai des analytes dans un échantillon liquide[2001/26]
Examination procedure18.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/34]
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2004Fee for grant paid
28.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.12.2005  13.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/46]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2005  13.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2006/04]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2005   
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
D-81635 München / DE
24.01.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.08.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
14.05.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.05.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.07.2013Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.05.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.06.2014Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition24.07.2008Appeal received No.  T1925/08
06.10.2008Statement of grounds filed
01.07.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
28.07.2008Appeal received No.  T1925/08
26.09.2008Statement of grounds filed
01.07.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
01.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
24.07.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
TR09.03.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY05.12.2005
IE05.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
ES07.12.2007
[2009/20]
Former [2007/20]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
TR09.03.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY05.12.2005
IE05.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2007/08]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
TR09.03.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE05.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/51]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
TR09.03.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE05.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/48]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE05.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/40]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/12]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH11161172  ;
 [A]US5304468  (PHILLIPS ROGER [US], et al);
 [A]US5515170  (MATZINGER DAVID P [US], et al);
 [A]EP0806662  (BAYER AG [US]);
 [A]WO9841868  (ACCUMETRICS INC [US]);
 [PX]WO0029831  (BANGS LAB INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.