|
21.02.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.02.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2011 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.06.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Request for accelerated search |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Request for accelerated search |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |