|
10.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.07.2005 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Annex |
Appeal |
28 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.12.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
59 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
24 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
349 |
|
08.04.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
89 |
|
08.04.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
26 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.05.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
184 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Request for accelerated search |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
234 |