EP1101584 - Method for manufacturing tiles having their exposed side provided with depressions and reliefs to reproduce the appearance of split quarrystone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gruppo Ceramiche Saicis S.P.A. 27, via Giorgi 41100 Modena / IT | [2001/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zini, Massimo Gruppo Ceramiche Saicis S.p.A., 27, via Giorgi 41100 Modena / IT | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Studio Ing. C. CORRADINI & C. S.r.l. 4, Via Dante Alighieri 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 00203852.9 | 03.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | IT1999RE00116 | 15.11.1999 Original published format: IT RE990116 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1101584 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1101584 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B28B3/02, B28B11/04, B28B7/00, B28B11/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
B28B11/0872 (EP);
B28B11/044 (EP);
B28B11/08 (EP);
B28B3/003 (EP);
B28B7/0064 (EP);
B28B7/342 (EP);
E04F13/147 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/51] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fliesen mit Vertiefungen und Reliefs auf der freiliegenden Seite um das Erscheinungsbild von Bruchstein nach zu bilden | [2001/21] | English: | Method for manufacturing tiles having their exposed side provided with depressions and reliefs to reproduce the appearance of split quarrystone | [2001/21] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de carreaux avec face visible pourvue de dépressions et de reliefs pour simuler l'apparence de pierre de carrière fondue | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP2001247387 ; | [AX]JPH0624874 ; | JPH0624874 [ ]; | [AX]JPH07144981 ; | [AX]JPH04327644 ; | [A]JPH07195027 ; | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001247387 A 20010911 (INAX CORP) [E] 1,9-11,24-26 * abstract * | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940506), vol. 018, no. 236, Database accession no. (C - 1196), & JP06024874 A 19940201 (NATL HOUSE IND CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * [X] 24-26 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 09, Database accession no. 1994-071765, XP002223309 & JPH0624874 A 19940201 (NATL HOUSE IND CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07144981 A 19950606 (INAX CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * [X] 24-26 | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930330), vol. 017, no. 164, Database accession no. (M - 1390), & JP04327644 A 19921117 (TOTO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * [X] 24 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07195027 A 19950801 (ONODA AUTOCLAVED LIGHT WEIGHT CONCRETE CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |