Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1077144 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1077144



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 429
11.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
06.05.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
25.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
06.12.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
30.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.08.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.08.2012 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.08.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.08.2012 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 7
13.08.2012 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.07.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
09.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.01.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.01.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 2
27.01.2011 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 1
25.01.2011 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.03.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.01.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.01.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
11.01.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
29.12.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
18.12.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
17.12.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.12.2009 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.11.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
26.11.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
26.11.2009 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.11.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.11.2009 Text intended for grant Opposition 15
26.06.2009 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
04.05.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
04.05.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2009 General enquiry Opposition 1
02.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2008 Description Opposition 3
24.11.2008 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
07.11.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.11.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
05.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2008 Description Opposition 4
25.08.2008 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
23.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.05.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
28.05.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
28.05.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
28.05.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.02.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
28.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
28.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.12.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
08.11.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.11.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2007 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2007 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.05.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.05.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.2007 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.04.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.04.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
17.04.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.04.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.03.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.12.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 2
06.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
27.03.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 3
15.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.02.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.01.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 3
28.09.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.09.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.08.2005 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
18.08.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
18.08.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.08.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
16.08.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
07.10.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.09.2004 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
16.08.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.08.2004 Translation of priority document Search / examination 27
21.07.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.06.2004 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
05.06.2004 Letter concerning the printing fee Search / examination 1
03.06.2004 Letter concerning the printing fee Search / examination 1
28.04.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.04.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.04.2004 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
02.04.2004 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
06.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
06.03.2004 Description Search / examination 1
06.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.02.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.11.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.11.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.11.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.09.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
15.09.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.09.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.07.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
11.07.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.07.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
11.02.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
10.01.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
10.01.2000 Description Search / examination 17
10.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Drawings Search / examination 5
10.01.2000 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6