EP1032188 - Rules-based queuing of calls to call-handling resources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gabriel, Camille 40 Watkins Road Baulkham Hills, NSW 2153 Sydney / AU | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [2000/35] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300571.7 | 26.01.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | US19990241717 | 02.02.1999 Original published format: US 241717 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032188 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032188 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/523 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
H04M3/5232 (EP,US);
H04M3/523 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/20] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Regelbasiertes Einreihen von Anrufen in Warteschlangen von anrufbearbeitenden Betriebsmittel | [2000/35] | English: | Rules-based queuing of calls to call-handling resources | [2000/35] | French: | Mise en files d'attentes régulée d' appels à des ressources de gestion d'appel | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 25.03.2002 | Appeal received No. T0865/02 | 20.05.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.06.2005 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2005/24] | 23.03.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 23.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 20.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0863651 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 9 *; | [T]EP0982917 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [T] 1 * column 1, line 33 - column 3, line 9 ** column 7, lines 29-50 * |