EP1033709 - Automatic splaying picker finger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luffel, Robert Wesley 1520 42nd Avenue Court Greeley, Colorado 80634 / US | 02 /
Coffin, Paul Clinton 1816 Serramonte Drive Fort Collins, Colorado 80524 / US | 03 /
Mueller, Robert Lee 35126 Cornerstone Way Windsor, CO 80550 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/36] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301265.5 | 17.02.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | US19990259573 | 01.03.1999 Original published format: US 259573 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033709 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033709 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/22, G11B15/68 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
G11B17/225 (EP,US);
G11B15/6835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/21] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatisch ausbreitender Finger einer Greifeinrichtung | [2000/36] | English: | Automatic splaying picker finger | [2000/36] | French: | Doigt de préhension décrochable automatiquement | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4742504 (TAKASUKA SHINGO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 21; figures 18,19 *; | [A]US4918548 (O'DONNELL MILES C [US], et al) [A] 1-10* figures 8A-8D *; | [Y]US5146375 (SATOH KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 12 - column 6, line 32; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US5687039 (COFFIN PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 3 * |