|
12.08.2010 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.12.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.07.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
24 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2008 |
F3093 Taking of evidence: Summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.01.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.06.2007 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.10.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |