EP1052419 - Apparatus for reducing distortion in fluidbearing surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smick, Theodore H. 31 Lufkin Pt. Rd. Essex, MA 01929 / US | 02 /
Sakase, Takao 27 Green Needle Ln. Rowley, MA 01969 / US | 03 /
Ryding, Geoffrey 30 Masconomo St. Manchester, MA 01944 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303190.3 | 14.04.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | US19990293955 | 19.04.1999 Original published format: US 293955 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1052419 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1052419 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/06 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
F16C32/0662 (EP,US);
F16C32/0603 (EP,US);
F16C33/748 (EP,US);
F16C2300/62 (EP,US);
H01J2237/166 (EP,US);
H01J2237/31701 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verringerung der Verbiegung der Lagerflächen von Flüssigkeitslagern | [2000/46] | English: | Apparatus for reducing distortion in fluidbearing surfaces | [2000/46] | French: | Appareil pour réduire la distorsion de surfaces de palier à fluide | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4191385 (FOX WAYNE L [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4325584 (CHRIST ALFRED, et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 14 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO8202235 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 18 - page 5, line 4; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4425508 (LEWIS JR GEORGE C [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7-10* column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US5003183 | US5229615 | WO9913488 |