EP1057410 - Method of preparing a block resistant non-derivatized food casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VISKASE CORPORATION 6855 West 65th Street Chicago, Illinois 60638 / US | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DuCharme, Paul Edmund, Jr. 8045 Apache Trail, Tinley Park Illinois 60477 / US | 02 /
Kajiwara, Edward Makoto 2509 West Sibley Park Ridge, Illinois 60068 / US | 03 /
Mc Garel, Owen Joseph 2015 Schumacher Lane Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303288.5 | 18.04.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | US19990325708 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: US 325708 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057410 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A22C13/00, C08L1/02 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
A22C13/0013 (EP);
C08L1/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L1/02, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/34] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer nicht derivatisierten und nicht zusammenklebenden Nahrungsmittelhülle | [2000/49] | English: | Method of preparing a block resistant non-derivatized food casing | [2000/49] | French: | Procede de preparation d'une enveloppe alimentaire non derivatisee et non autocollante | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/18] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5470519 (MARKULIN JOHN [US]) [XD] 1,2,4,5,11,12,15 * examples 1-32; claims 1,3 *; | [A]USH1592H (NICHOLSON MYRON D [US]) [A] * column 24, lines 9-26 *; | [X]EP0819725 (VISKASE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,11,12,15 * examples 4,6 *; | [X]EP0896793 (VISKASE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 9, lines 25-51; claims 1,2 * |