EP1049358 - Electric heater assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceramaspeed Limited Zortech Avenue, Oldington Kidderminster Worcestershire DY11 7DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Ceramaspeed Limited Zortech Avenue, Oldington Kidderminster, Worcestershire DY11 7DY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Richard Charles 47 Farm Road Stourport-on-Severn, Worcestersh.DY139DQ / GB | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates, The Old Yard, Lower Town Claines, Worcester WR3 7RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303417.0 | 25.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | GB19990009636 | 27.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9909636 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1049358 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1049358 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
H05B3/746 (EP);
H05B2213/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/26] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrische Heizungsanordnung | [2000/44] | English: | Electric heater assembly | [2000/44] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage électrique | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.05.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5893996 (GROSS MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,1 * column 1, lines 48-67 - column 10 *; | [A]WO9313634 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,1 * page 3 - page 8; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US5012206 (TIGGES BURKHARD [DE]) [A] 1,1 * column 2, lines 39-68 - column 8; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3508289 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH) [A] 1,1 * column 3, lines 56-62 - column 16, lines 24-35; claim 1 * |