EP1057894 - Esterase genes and uses of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2010/17] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishimoto, Kae 7-12-9-111 Okamoto, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Takashima, Yoshiki 3-11-9 Higashiyamadai Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Yuko 3-7-A35-104 Shinsenrihigashi-machi Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Ayumu 2-30-123 Uegahara 10 ban-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo / JP | [2010/01] |
Former [2000/49] | 01 /
Kishimoto, Kae 7-12-9-111 Okamoto, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | Representative(s) | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304685.1 | 01.06.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | JP19990158199 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: JP 15819999 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1057894 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1057894 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057894 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N9/18, C12N15/70, C12N1/21, C12P17/10 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
C12P17/10 (EP,US);
C12N9/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Title | German: | Esterase Gene und Verwendungen davon | [2000/49] | English: | Esterase genes and uses of the same | [2000/49] | French: | Gènes d'estérase et leurs utilisations | [2009/48] |
Former [2000/49] | Gènes d'esterase et ses utilisations | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IE | 01.06.2010 | LU | 01.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/19] | CY | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 01.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 28.04.2010 | |
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 28.04.2010 | |
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 08.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4857462 (MAIER JOSEF [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, paragraph 2; claims 1,3 *; | [L]WO9009446 (PLANT GENETIC SYSTEMS NV [BE]) [L] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]US5482847 (OZAKI EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-12,14-16 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 33; example 3 *; | [Y]WO9904015 (CHIROTECH TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X] - VAN DER VLUGT-BERGMANS C. ET AL., "B.cinerea cutinase A gene", EMBL, (19960202), XP002180179 [X] 1 * the whole document * |