EP1059670 - Damascene FeRAM cell structure and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Shen Teng 2216 NM Trout Court Camas, WA 98607 / US | 02 /
Evans, David Russell 7574 SW 179th Place Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304958.2 | 12.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | US19990330900 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: US 330900 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059670 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059670 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/8246, H01L21/8242 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
H01L28/55 (EP,US);
H01L27/105 (KR);
H10B53/00 (EP,US);
H10B53/30 (EP,US);
H01L28/91 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/50] | H01L27/115, H01L21/8247 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/18] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Damaszene-FeRAM-Zellstruktur und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [2000/50] | English: | Damascene FeRAM cell structure and method for making same | [2000/50] | French: | Structure de cellule à FeRAM de damascène et son procédé de fabrication | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 01.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 05.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5644151 (IZUMI HIROHIKO [JP], et al); | [XA]US5696017 (UENO KAZUYOSHI [JP]); | [PX]US6017790 (LIOU FU-TAI [TW], et al) | Examination | US5828092 |