|
08.07.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2000 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2000 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |