EP1078771 - An adjustment method of printing positions, a printing apparatus and a printing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/23] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Miyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tajika, Hiroshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Konno, Yuji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Shuichi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kawatoko, Norihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Ogasahara, Takayuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Edamura, Tetsuya Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Maeda, Tetsuhiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307064.6 | 17.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | JP19990236260 | 24.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23626099 | JP20000219758 | 19.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000219758 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1078771 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1078771 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078771 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/21, B41J19/14 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
B41J2/2135 (EP,US);
B41J19/145 (EP,US);
B41J2/04573 (US);
B41J2/04586 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/03] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einstellen der Druckpositionen, Druckgerät und Drucksystem | [2001/09] | English: | An adjustment method of printing positions, a printing apparatus and a printing system | [2001/09] | French: | Méthode d'ajustement des positions d'impression, appareil d'impression et système d'impression | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 14.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 29.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1177991 ; | [A]EP0540245 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,10,12,21,23-27,33-56 * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 54; figure 3 *; | [A]US5343231 (SUZUKI AKIO [JP]) [A] 33-56* column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 19 *; | [A]EP0616896 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 33-56 * column 5, line 1 - line 21 *; | [A]EP0895869 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10,12,21,23-27,33-56 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0109]; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11077991 A 19990323 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 33-56 * abstract * | by applicant | US4920355 | JPH06320732 | JPH07242025 | JPH1148587 |