|
14.10.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
12.05.2015 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
16.02.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
17 |
|
16.12.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2014 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Request for correction of client data |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
26 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
26 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
25.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |