EP1087567 - DECENTRALIZED NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/13] | Decentralized network system | ||
[2017/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snowdon, Dave 2 Rue des Bergers 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Glance, Natalie S. 14 alle'e de la Praly 38240 Meylan / FR | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/47] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/19] | Manley, Nicholas Michael, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2001/13] | Walker, Antony James Alexander, et al W.P. Thomson & Co., Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307396.2 | 29.08.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | US19990404175 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: US 404175 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1087567 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1087567 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1087567 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04W8/24, H04W4/12, H04W28/14, H04W88/04 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
H04W8/24 (EP,US);
H04W28/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | H04L12/24, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2001/13] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/31] |
Former [2005/29] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DEZENTRALISIERTES NETZWERKSYSTEM | [2017/11] | English: | DECENTRALIZED NETWORK SYSTEM | [2017/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU DÉCENTRALISÉ | [2017/11] |
Former [2001/13] | Dezentralisiertes Netzwerksystem | ||
Former [2001/13] | Decentralized network system | ||
Former [2001/13] | Système de réseau décentralisé | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Request for further processing for: | 11.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5225826 (DELUCA JOAN S [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2 - column 3 ** column 11 - column 12 *; | [XD] - BOROVOY R ET AL, "Meme tags and community mirrors: moving from conferences to collaboration", ACM 1998 CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER SUPPORTED COOPERATIVE WORK. PROCEEDINGS. CSCW 98 ACM NEW YORK, NY, USA, (1998), ISBN 1-58113-009-0, pages 159 - 168, XP002294164 [XD] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/289444.289490 | Examination | - DUBE R ET AL, "SIGNAL STABILITY-BASED ADAPTIVE ROUTING (SSA) FOR AD HOC MOBILE NETWORKS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (19970201), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1109/98.575990, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 36 - 45, XP000679252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.575990 |