EP1090826 - Friction wedge for a railroad car truck having a replaceable wear member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states English Welsh & Scottish Railway Holdings Limited Lakeside Business Park Carolina Way Doncaster South Yorkshire DN4 5PN / GB | [2009/22] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states English Welsh & Scottish Railway Holdings Limited McBeath House 310 Goswell Road London WC1V 7LW / GB | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Powell Duffryn Rail Limited Cambrian House, Charnwood Court Parc Nantgarw, Cardiff CF15 7QZ / GB | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Meridian Rail Information Systems Corporation 335 Eisenhower Lane South Lombard, Illinois 60148 / US | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Naco Incorporated 335 Eisenhower Lane South Lombard, Illinois 60148 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duncan, Scott R. 86 East Harbor Drive Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | 02 /
Irving, Robert M. 746 Bluff Street, 204 Carol Stream, IL 60188 / US | 03 /
Skawinski, Valerian S. 440 E. Butterfield Road Elmhurst, Illinois 60126 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
Duncan, Scott R. 86 East Harbor Drive Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | ||
02 /
Irving, Robert M. 746 Bluff Street,#204 Carol Stream, IL 60188 / US | |||
03 /
Skawinski, Valerian S. 440 E. Butterfield Road Elmhurst, Illinois 60126 / US | |||
Former [2001/15] | 01 /
Duncan, Scott R. 86 East Harbor Drive Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | ||
02 /
Irving, Robert M. 146 S. Berteau Avenue Bartlett, Illinois 60103 / US | |||
03 /
Skawinski, Valerian S. 440 E. Butterfield Road Elmhurst, Illinois 60126 / US | Representative(s) | Lamb, Richard Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Lamb, Richard Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2003/26] | Bailey, Richard Alan, et al Marks & Clerk, 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/15] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308739.2 | 04.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | US19990414368 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: US 414368 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1090826 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/12 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
B61F5/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Reibungskeil eines Eisenbahndrehgestells mit einem austauschbaren Verschleisselement | [2001/15] | English: | Friction wedge for a railroad car truck having a replaceable wear member | [2001/15] | French: | Coin de friction pour bogie ferroviaire ayant un élément d'usure remplaçable | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.11.2002 | 31.10.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DAX]US2827987 (WILLIAMS RAY C) [DA] 1,18-20 * column 4, lines 66-74; figures 2-4 * [X] 21; | [A]US3559589 (WILLIAMS RAY C) [A] 1,18-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US3834320 (TACK C) [A] 1,18-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US4986192 (WIEBE DONALD [US]) |