blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1104150

EP1104150 - Cordless telephone with MP3 player capability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cao, Qinghong
1050 Treeline Drive
Allentown, Pennsylvania 18103 / US
02 / Jin, Liang
826 Ward Street No. 7
Allentown, Pennsylvania 18103 / US
03 / Luo, Wenzhe
243 Lenape Trall
Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104 / US
04 / Wu, Jian
2270 Chablis Drive
Macungie, Pennsylvania 18062 / US
05 / Ma, Zhigang
218 North 36th Street
Pennsylvania 18104 / US
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Williams, David John, et al
Page White & Farrer Limited
Bedford House
21A John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Williams, David John, et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date00310081.513.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateUS1999044728423.11.1999         Original published format: US 447284
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1104150
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1104150
Date:29.10.2003
[2003/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1104150
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/725
[2001/22]
CPC:
H04M1/72502 (EP,US); H04M1/72442 (EP,US); H04M1/72409 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US); H04M1/6041 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/30]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schnurloses Telefon mit MP3-Spieler Funktion[2001/22]
English:Cordless telephone with MP3 player capability[2001/22]
French:Téléphone sans fil muni d'un lecteur MP3[2001/22]
Examination procedure27.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
01.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
01.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2011Fee for grant paid
16.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination03.08.2006Appeal received No.  T1698/06
09.10.2006Statement of grounds filed
24.05.2007Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.04.2004
Opposition(s)06.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
17.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9900962  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 26 *;
 [X]WO9943136  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 23 * * page 4, line 19 - page 10, line 9 *;
 [XP]WO0038340  (KIM JAEHAN [KR]) [XP] 1-28 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 10 ** figure 1 *
ExaminationJPH11112615
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.