EP1101788 - Preparation of organoxy-terminated organopolysiloxane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyake, Masatoshi, Silicone-Electronics Materials Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Masuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsui, Chinami, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Kenichi, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Fujiki, Hironao, Silicone-Electronics Materials Shin-Etsu Chemicals Co., Ltd., 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Mastsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310171.4 | 16.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | JP19990327415 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32741599 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101788 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1101788 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/38, C08L83/04 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C08G77/08 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08G77/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/08] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herstellung von Organopolysiloxan mit Organoxy-Endgruppen | [2001/21] | English: | Preparation of organoxy-terminated organopolysiloxane | [2001/21] | French: | Préparation d'un organopolysiloxane à terminaisons organoxy | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU180143 [ ] (TSNII BUMAGI); | [X]US3151099 (FREDERIC CEYZERIAT LOUIS, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 11 - line 15 * * column 1, line 35 - line 41 * * column 3, line 12 - line 36 * * example 2 *; | [DX]US3542901 (COOPER KENNETH G, et al) [DX] 1-6 * column 1, line 23 - line 27 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 9 - line 17 * * column 3, line 67 - line 71 * * column 4, line 3 - line 4 * * example 1 *; | [X] - HCA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002160835 [X] 1-6 * abstract * |