EP1106239 - Method for purifying waste gas containing ammonia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graville, Stephen Rhys 8 Rossington Road, Hunters Bar Sheffield, S11 3LT / GB | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310453.6 | 24.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | GB19990029332 | 10.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9929332 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106239 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106239 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106239 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/58, C01B3/04 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
B01D53/58 (EP,US);
C01B3/047 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | B01D53/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Ammoniak-enthaltenden Abgasen | [2001/24] | English: | Method for purifying waste gas containing ammonia | [2001/24] | French: | Procédé pour la purification des gaz résiduaries contenant de l'ammoniaque | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 22.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2004 | BE | 09.06.2004 | CH | 09.06.2004 | CY | 09.06.2004 | FI | 09.06.2004 | IT | 09.06.2004 | LI | 09.06.2004 | NL | 09.06.2004 | TR | 09.06.2004 | DK | 09.09.2004 | GR | 09.09.2004 | SE | 09.09.2004 | ES | 20.09.2004 | PT | 09.11.2004 | IE | 24.11.2004 | LU | 24.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
CY | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
IT | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
LU | 24.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
CY | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
LU | 24.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
LI | 09.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB676287 (BAKER & CO) [Y] 1-6,10,11 * page 2, line 21 - line 72 * * page 3, line 26 - line 46 *; | [X]US3661507 (BREITBACH FRITZ, et al) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 12 - line 35 * * column 2, line 44 - line 55 * * column 4, line 5 - line 43; claim 1 *; | [A]US4395390 (DESGRANDCHAMPS GUY [FR], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US5904910 (STEVENS DAVID K [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,10,11 * column 5, line 12 - line 63; claims 1-4 * |