EP1072586 - Purification of alkanesulfonic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atofina Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gancet, Christian 4, Rue de la Digue 64140 Lons / FR | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Granet, Pierre ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Granet, Pierre Atofina, Département Propriété Industrielle, 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/05] | Leboulenger, Jean Atofina, Département Propriété Industrielle, 4/8, cours Michelet, La Défence 10 92091 Paris la Défense Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401653.1 | 13.06.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | FR19990009712 | 27.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909712 | [2001/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072586 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1072586 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/44, C07C309/04 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
C07C303/44 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C303/44, C07C309/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Alkansulfonsäuren | [2001/05] | English: | Purification of alkanesulfonic acids | [2001/05] | French: | Purification d'acides alcanesulfoniques | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.11.2002 | FI | 13.11.2002 | GB | 13.11.2002 | GR | 13.11.2002 | IE | 13.11.2002 | IT | 13.11.2002 | NL | 13.11.2002 | DK | 13.02.2003 | PT | 13.02.2003 | SE | 13.02.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | CY | 13.06.2003 | LU | 13.06.2003 | BE | 30.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/14] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
DK | 13.02.2003 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
CY | 13.06.2003 | ||
LU | 13.06.2003 | ||
BE | 30.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
DK | 13.02.2003 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
CY | 13.06.2003 | ||
LU | 13.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
CY | 13.06.2003 | ||
LU | 13.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
CY | 13.06.2003 | ||
LU | 13.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
CY | 13.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
IE | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 13.11.2002 | |
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 13.11.2002 | |
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 13.02.2003 | |
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 13.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6150957 ; | [A]US3496224 (AYERS GEORGE W, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB1264293 (CONTINENTAL OIL) [A] 1 * page 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2305429 (STANDARD OIL CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US5028736 (GIRRBACH ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5434301 (KOZAK WILLIAM G [US]) [A] 1 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860722), vol. 010, no. 208, Database accession no. (C - 361), & JP61050957 A 19860313 (DAIICHI SEIMO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |