EP1070506 - Disinfection of endoscopes with an aqueous solution of peracetic acid and hydrogen peroxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/04] | Sterilisation of endoscopes with an aqueous solution of peracetic acid and hydrogen peroxide | ||
[2004/20] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES, S.E.P.P.I.C. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES, S.E.P.P.I.C. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES, S.E.P.P.I.C. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
For all designated states Bioxal 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gamet, Jean Claude Maizeray 71460 Saint Martin du Tartre / FR | 02 /
Gouges, Yves 44, rue Liancourt 75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
Le Rouzic, Daniel 23, avenue des Lilas 95120 Ermont / FR | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Conan, Philippe Claude, et al L'Air Liquide Services Brevets et Marques 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Conan, Philippe Claude, et al L'Air Liquide, Services Brevets et Marques, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401988.1 | 10.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | FR19990009015 | 12.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909015 | [2001/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070506 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070506 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, A61B1/12 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
A61L2/186 (EP);
A61B1/123 (EP);
A61L2202/17 (EP);
A61L2202/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Desinfektion von Endoskopen mit einer wässrigen Lösung aus Peressigsäure und Wasserstoffperoxid | [2004/20] | English: | Disinfection of endoscopes with an aqueous solution of peracetic acid and hydrogen peroxide | [2004/20] | French: | Désinfection d'endoscopes avec une solution aqueuse d'acide peracétique et de peroxyde d'hydrogène | [2004/20] |
Former [2001/04] | Desinfektion von endoskopen mit einer wässrigen lösung aus peressigsäure und wasserstoffperoxid | ||
Former [2001/04] | Sterilisation of endoscopes with an aqueous solution of peracetic acid and hydrogen peroxide | ||
Former [2001/04] | Désinfection d'endoscope à l'aide d'une solution aqueuse d'acide péracétique et de péroxyde d'hydrogène | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2005
24.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE ECOLAB INC. 840 Sibley Memorial Highway Mendota Heights MN 55118 / US Opponent's representative polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2005
24.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE ECOLAB INC. 840 Sibley Memorial Highway Mendota Heights MN 55118 / US Opponent's representative Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2005
24.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Ecolab Inc. 840 Sibley Memorial Highway Mendota Heights, Minnesota 55118 / US Opponent's representative Godemeyer, Thomas, Dr. Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 1107 51482 Overath / DE | 10.08.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.02.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.06.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/35] | Appeal following opposition | 08.06.2007 | Appeal received No. T1081/07 | 06.08.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.06.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 04.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | IE | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | CY | 10.07.2005 | LU | 10.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | CH | 31.07.2005 | LI | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
CY | 10.07.2005 | ||
LU | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
CY | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9415465 (SOLVAY INTEROX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,7,12,16-21 * page 5, line 2 - page 6, line 28 * * page 7, line 9 - line 24 * * claims 1,4,5,20-22 * * example 1 *; | [A]US5425815 (PARKER GEORGE C [GB], et al) [A] 1,3-6 * column 1, line 5 - line 44 ** column 2, line 4 - line 25 *; | [X]EP0658309 (CHEMOXAL SA [FR]) [X] 1,7,13,16-18,20,21 * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 31 * * examples 2-6 *; | [DX]EP0873687 (CHEMOXAL SA [FR], et al) [DX] 1,2,7-25 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 33 * * page 4, line 2 - line 47 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 1 - line 4 * |