EP1083645 - Electronic trip device comprising initializing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2016/01] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SA 89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suptitz, Eric, Schneider Electric Industries SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Blanchard, Pierre, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | [2016/01] |
Former [2001/11] | 01 /
Suptitz, Eric, Schneider Electric Industries SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | ||
02 /
Blanchard, Pierre, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | Representative(s) | Tripodi, Paul, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle World Trade Center / 38EE1 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2016/01] |
Former [2009/52] | Tripodi, Paul, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle World Trade Center / 38EE1 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Schneider Electric SA Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2006/40] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Propriété Industrielle - E1 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2001/11] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée Schneider Electric SA, Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00410097.0 | 11.08.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | FR19990011440 | 09.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9911440 | [2001/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083645 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083645 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02H6/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
H02H6/005 (EP,US);
H02H1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2016/01] |
Former [2001/49] | DE, GB, IT | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronischer Auslöser mit Initialisierungseinrichtung | [2001/11] | English: | Electronic trip device comprising initializing apparatus | [2001/11] | French: | Déclencheur électronique comportant un dispositif d'initialisation | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.12.2015 | [2016/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5313112 (MACKS HAROLD R [US]) [Y] 1-7* column A *; | [Y]EP0915547 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | Examination | EP0827250 | FR2768868 | by applicant | EP0915547 |