|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.05.2009 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.05.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.02.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
03.05.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
13.03.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.10.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
35 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |