EP1072737 - Apparatus for cleaning, disinfecting and deodorizing exhaust gases from sealed tombs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roard, Dany Lilian 1325 Route de Vallauris 06250 Mougins / FR | For all designated states Roard, Yann 60, Rue Emile Dechame, Le Marianne, Bât B 06700 St Laurent du Var / FR | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/05] | Application number, filing date | 00480072.8 | 28.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | FR19990009935 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909935 | [2001/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072737 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04H13/00, B01D53/04, B01D53/14, B01D47/02 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
B01D47/021 (EP);
B01D53/04 (EP);
B01D53/14 (EP);
E04H13/005 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2257/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/42] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorichtung zur Reinigung, Desinfektion und Deodorisierung von Abgasen aus geschlossenen Grabstätten | [2001/05] | English: | Apparatus for cleaning, disinfecting and deodorizing exhaust gases from sealed tombs | [2001/05] | French: | Appareil d'épuration, de désinfection et de désodorisation des effluents gazeux d'une cellule mortuaire étanche | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/32] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.09.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5217622 (FLORES JOSE E [BR]) [A] 1,2,8 * figure 3; claim 2 *; | [A]FR2651522 (AUGIAS FRANCIS) [A] 1,2,8,9 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2432885 (LUGARI FRANC [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2465851 (POTHIER BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2557902 (AUGIAS FRANCIS [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |