EP1197138 - Process and system for influencing the atmospheric circulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pissas, Nikolaos Theklas Liosioti 17 Lemesos / CY | For all designated states Uibo, Valeriy Theklas Lisioti 17 Lemesos / CY | For all designated states Olin, Vladimir Theklas Lisioti 17 Lemesos / CY | For all designated states Dadamiants, Vladislar Theklas Lisioti 17 Lemesos / CY | For all designated states Mokrouchina, Irina Theklas Lisioti 17 Lemesos / CY | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Pephani, Mata 11 Fidiou Street 106 78 Athens / GR | [2002/16] | Application number, filing date | 00600003.8 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197138 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01G15/00 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
A01G15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [2003/02] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zum Beeinflussen von atmosphärischem Umlauf | [2002/16] | English: | Process and system for influencing the atmospheric circulation | [2002/16] | French: | Procédé et installation pour influencer la circulation atmosphérique | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/31] | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.12.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]RU2105463 ; | [A]RU2098942 ; | [A]RU2102866 ; | [A]US5411209 (OLLIVIER GERALD [CA]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 12 - line 68 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 41, Database accession no. 1998-479447, XP002163030 & RU2105463 C 19980227 (PROTOPOPOV V A) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 32, Database accession no. 1998-375428, XP002163031 & RU2098942 C 19971220 (PESTOV D A) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 39, Database accession no. 1998-454811, XP002163032 & RU2102866 C 19980127 (SOLODOVNIKOV V I) [A] 1 * abstract * |