EP1106132 - Vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/24] | Device for a vacuum cleaner | ||
[2003/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKTIEBOLAGET ELECTROLUX 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget Electrolux 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindquist, Tommy Värmlandsvägen 238 123 48 Farsta / SE | 02 /
Nyberg, Curt Bansjöslingan 36 135 54 Tyresö / SE | 03 /
Zita, Johann Östgötagatan 74 116 64 Stockholm / SE | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Schmerer, Sven Erik c/o AB ELECTROLUX, Corporate Patents & Trademarks 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Schmerer, Sven Erik c/o AB ELECTROLUX, Corporate Patents & Trademarks 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00850189.2 | 06.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | SE19990004400 | 03.12.1999 Original published format: SE 9904400 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106132 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106132 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106132 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/24, A47L13/40, A47L7/00, A47L13/502 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
A47L7/0057 (EP,US);
A47L7/00 (KR);
A47L13/38 (EP,US);
A47L13/40 (EP,US);
A47L13/502 (EP,US);
A47L9/0009 (EP,US);
A47L9/248 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | A47L9/24, A47L13/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/24] | Title | German: | Staubsauger | [2003/07] | English: | Vacuum cleaner | [2003/07] | French: | Aspirateur | [2003/07] |
Former [2001/24] | Vorrichtung für einen Staubsauger | ||
Former [2001/24] | Device for a vacuum cleaner | ||
Former [2001/24] | Dispositif pour aspirateur | Examination procedure | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 02.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2003 | BE | 17.12.2003 | CH | 17.12.2003 | CY | 17.12.2003 | FI | 17.12.2003 | LI | 17.12.2003 | NL | 17.12.2003 | TR | 17.12.2003 | DK | 17.03.2004 | GR | 17.03.2004 | SE | 17.03.2004 | PT | 17.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
CY | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
TR | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
TR | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 17.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08336494 ; | [A]US1785873 (MULLER EDWARD J) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2240107 (WELLS SHERMAN F) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * figure - *; | [A]US2247549 (JOHN FREDERICK) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 7 - line 28 * * figure - *; | [A]US2335460 (SMELLIE DONALD G) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 43 - line 72 * * figure - *; | [A]GB2274052 (BRODERICK PATRICK JOSEPH [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE19644589 (WESSEL WERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract ** figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08336494 A 19961224 (IEIRI KOKI;MAEZAWA KIZO) [A] 1 * the whole document * |