EP1111571 - Device for use in gaming , information displaying and data processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funworld AG Photo Play Strasse 1 4861 Schörfling / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Funworld ag Photo Play Strasse 1 4861 Schörfling / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Öhlinger, Josef Hauptstrasse 63 4813 Altmünster / AT | [2006/12] |
Former [2001/26] | 01 /
Ohlinger, Josef Hauptstrasse 63 4813 Altmünster / AT | Representative(s) | Weinzinger, Arnulf, et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Weinzinger, Arnulf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler-Pavlik Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00890376.7 | 18.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | AT19990002163 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: AT 216399 | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111571 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111571 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09F27/00 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
G09F27/00 (EP);
A47B2200/0075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Unterhaltung, Informationswiedergabe oder Datenverarbeitung | [2001/26] | English: | Device for use in gaming , information displaying and data processing | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif pour l'amusement, l'information ou le traitement de données | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/51] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9930267 (SOLTESZ JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0546477 (TECMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4440457 (FOGELMAN H FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5663746 (PELLENBERG ALAN [US], et al) [AD] 1 * figure 1A; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE9318505U (HEDDIER ELECTRONIC GES FUER IN [DE]) [AD] * claim 1 * |