|
10.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.08.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
22.05.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2007 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.04.2007 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.01.2007 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.12.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2006 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2006 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.09.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
15.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.08.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
03.08.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |