blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1153269

EP1153269 - LATERAL MODE STABILIZER FOR CORIOLIS FLOWMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2021Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 30.06.2021  [2021/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICRO MOTION INCORPORATED
7070 Winchester Circle Boulder
Colorado 80301 / US
[2018/39]
Former [2001/46]For all designated states
MICRO MOTION INCORPORATED
7070 Winchester Circle
Boulder Colorado 80301 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OLLILA, Curtis, John
382 Crescent Lake Road
Golden, CO 80403 / US
 [2002/01]
Former [2001/46]01 / OLLILA, Curtis, John
13508 Vallejo Street
Westminster, CO 80334 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
P.O. Box 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
[2018/39]
Former [2012/52]Hartwell, Ian Peter, et al
Ollila Law Limited
Unit 5, The Courtyard, Wixford Park
Bidford on Avon
Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB
Former [2011/19]Holmes, Matthew William, et al
Ollila Law Limited First Floor Unit 5 The Courtyard Wixford Park Bidford on Avon
Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB
Former [2011/19]Holmes, Matthew William, et al
Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen
Henley-in-Arden B95 6HJ / GB
Former [2007/43]Holmes, Matthew William, et al
Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen
Warwickshire, B95 6HJ / GB
Former [2007/36]Lane, Michael John, et al
Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen
Warwickshire B95 6HJ / GB
Former [2001/46]Goodanew, Martin Eric, et al
MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date00905678.920.01.2000
[2001/46]
WO2000US01367
Priority number, dateUS1999024742910.02.1999         Original published format: US 247429
[2001/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0047956
Date:17.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1153269
Date:14.11.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1153269
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2000
ClassificationIPC:G01F1/84
[2001/46]
CPC:
G01F1/8409 (EP,US); G01F1/84 (KR); G01F1/8413 (EP,US);
G01F1/8418 (EP,US); G01F1/849 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2018/39]
Former [2001/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:LATERALMODUS-STABILISATOR FÜR CORIOLISDURCHFLUSSMESSER[2018/20]
English:LATERAL MODE STABILIZER FOR CORIOLIS FLOWMETER[2001/46]
French:STABILISATEUR D'UN MODE LATERAL DESTINE A UN DEBITMETRE A EFFET CORIOLIS[2018/21]
Former [2001/46]IM LATERALEN MODUS ARBEITENDEN STABILISATOR FÜR CORIOLISDURCHFLUSSMESSER
Former [2001/46]STABILISATEUR EN MODE LATERAL DESTINE A UN DEBITMETRE A EFFET DE CORIOLIS
Entry into regional phase06.08.2001National basic fee paid 
06.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
30.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.07.2018Fee for grant paid
12.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.08.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
17.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination11.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0916/15
13.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2017Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
19.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.01.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2007
Opposition(s)27.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 18
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 19
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.09.2018
CY26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
IE20.01.2019
LU20.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
[2021/26]
Former [2020/09]AT26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
IE20.01.2019
LU20.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2019/51]AT26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
LU20.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2019/44]AT26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
LU20.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AT26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AT26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AT26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AT26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI26.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0598287  (OVAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8 * page 4, line 10 - line 17; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0733886  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * page 8, line 45 - page 9, line 37; figure 4 *;
 [X]DE19738332  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5731527  (VAN CLEVE CRAIG BRAINERD [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 6, line 8 - line 25; figures 3,4,6 *;
 [PX]US5945609  (KASHIMURA OSAMU [JP], et al) [PX] 1,8* column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-3 *;
 [PX]US5979246  (VAN CLEVE CRAIG BRAINERD [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * column 13, line 1 - column 15, line 31; figures 16-30; claim 11 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.