|
30.10.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.05.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.05.2009 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
5 |