EP1092270 - ADDRESS GENERATOR AND ADDRESS GENERATING METHOD FOR USE IN A TURBO INTERLEAVER/DEINTERLEAVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-ku Suwon-shi Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Min-Goo 973-3 Youngtong-dong, Paltal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do 442-470 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Beong-Jo Mujigaemaeul 201 Kumi-dong, Puntang-gu Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-500 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Young-Hwan 237-3 Chongja-dong, Puntang-gu Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-010 / KR | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915576.3 | 03.04.2000 | [2001/16] | WO2000KR00301 | Priority number, date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 Original published format: KR 9912859 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0060751 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092270 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092270 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/00, H03M13/27, H03M13/29 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H03M13/2771 (EP,US);
H03M13/00 (KR);
H03M13/275 (EP,US);
H03M13/2764 (EP,US);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/16] | H03M1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ADRESSGENERATOR UND ADRESSERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG IN EINEM TURBOVERSCHATELER/ENTSCHACHTELER | [2004/22] | English: | ADDRESS GENERATOR AND ADDRESS GENERATING METHOD FOR USE IN A TURBO INTERLEAVER/DEINTERLEAVER | [2001/16] | French: | GENERATEUR D'ADRESSES ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT S'UTILISANT DANS UN ENTRELACEUR/DESENTRELACEUR TURBO | [2001/16] |
Former [2001/16] | ADRESSGENERATOR UND ADRESSERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG IN EINME TURBOVERSCHACHTELER/ENTSCHACHTELER | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "A New Low-Complexity Turbo Code Interleaver Employing Linear Congruential Sequences", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT 2, 3GGP2, WORKING GROUP 3 CONTRIBUTION, pages 1 - 14, XP002237239 [A] 1-12 * figure 5 * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 7 * * page 7, equation 5 * * page 11 * * table 7 * | International search | [A]JPH05300028 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [A]EP0660558 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [A]EP0715432 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]JPH09102748 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |