EP1164963 - CRYOSURGICAL FLUID SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovascular Systems, Inc. 105 Cooper Court Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOYE, James Unit C 258 East Main Street Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Richard S. 611 Topaz Street 2 Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Ronald 149 Campo Bello Lane Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00917946.6 | 14.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US06744 | Priority number, date | US19990268205 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: US 268205 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054684 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164963 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164963 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/02 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
A61B18/0218 (EP,US);
A61B18/02 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22054 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0262 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | A61B18/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | KRYOCHIRURGISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITSZUFÜHRUNG | [2002/01] | English: | CRYOSURGICAL FLUID SUPPLY | [2002/01] | French: | APPORT DE FLUIDE CRYOCHIRURGICAL | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09013873.6 / EP2147648 | EP10012049.2 / EP2292170 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | GB | 14.03.2010 | LU | 14.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/17] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
GB | 14.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5147355 (FRIEDMAN PETER L [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - line 64 * * column 3, line 33 - line 43 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO9530379 (SPEMBLY MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 12 - line 22 * * page 14, line 23 - line 30 ** figures 1,6 *; | [X]WO9852479 (FIBER TECH MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * page 6, line 7 - line 13 * * page 9, line 16 - line 30 * * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 18 * * page 19, line 11 - line 17 * * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US3630203 (SELLINGER MARTIN S, et al); | [Y]US5117870 (GOODALE DAVID L [US], et al); | [A]US5814040 (NELSON J STUART [US], et al); | [Y]US5846235 (PASRICHA PANKAJ JAY [US], et al); | [YP]US5868735 (LAFONTAINE DANIEL M [US]); | [XP]US6027499 (JOHNSTON MARK H [US], et al) | by applicant | US3901241 | US4336691 | US4754752 | WO9105528 | US5019075 | US5041089 | US5078713 | US5092841 | US5106360 | US5147355 | US5151100 | US5190539 | US5191883 | US5196024 | US5275595 | US5486208 | US5501681 | US5617739 | US5644502 | WO9838934 | US6355029 | US6428534 |