EP1175218 - OCULAR THERAPY IN KERATOCONJUCTIVITIS SICCA USING TOPICALLY APPLIED ANDROGENS OR TGF-BETA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Change - refusal | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SCHEPENS EYE RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. 20 Staniford Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, David, A. 120 Fulton Street, No 203 Boston, MA 02109 / US | [2002/10] |
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
SULLIVAN, David, A. 507 Main Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00917961.5 | 15.03.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000US06787 | Priority number, date | US19990271600 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: US 271600 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054779 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175218 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56, A61K31/568, A61P27/02 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K31/568 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | A61K31/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUGENTHERAPIE DER KERATOCONJUNCTIVITIS SICCA DURCH TOPISCHE ANWENDUNG VON ANDROGENEN UND TGF-BETA | [2002/05] | English: | OCULAR THERAPY IN KERATOCONJUCTIVITIS SICCA USING TOPICALLY APPLIED ANDROGENS OR TGF-BETA | [2002/05] | French: | THERAPIE OCULAIRE POUR LA KERATOCONJONCTIVITE SECHE BASEE SUR L'APPLICATION LOCALE D'ANDROGENES OU DE TGF-BETA | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 27.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 08.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/24] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/24] | 08.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 31.03.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4617299 (KNEPPER PAUL A [US]) [DY] 39* column 7, paragraph 2 *; | [XY]WO9320823 (SCHEPEN S EYE RESEARCH INST IN [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document * [Y] 39; | [XY]WO9640183 (SCHEPENS EYE RES INST [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document * [Y] 39; | [A] - VENDRAMINI A C L M ET AL, "Testosterone-induced suppression of autoimmune disease in lacrimal tissue of a mouse model (NZB/NZW F1) of Sjogren's syndrome", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE 1991 UNITED STATES, (1991), vol. 32, no. 11, ISSN 0146-0404, pages 3002 - 3006, XP002351077 [A] 1-39 * page 3002 * | [A] - STERN M E ET AL, "THE PATHOLOGY OF DRY EYE: THE INTERACTION BETWEEN THE OCULAR SURFACE AND LACRIMAL GLANDS", CORNEA, MASSON PUBL., NEW YORK, NY, US, (199811), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0277-3740, pages 584 - 589, XP009010472 [A] 1-39 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00003226-199811000-00002 | International search | [A]US4863912 (SOUTHREN AARON L [US], et al) |