|
05.11.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.06.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2013 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
43 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
43 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
43 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
43 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
52 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
52 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2008 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
22.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
172 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.09.2001 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2001 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
208 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
171 |