EP1094720 - ANIMAL FEED AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamamoto, Masahiro 1103 Seaside Mansion, 26-1 Kamoike-Shinmachi Kagoshima-shi Kagoshima-ken 890-0064 / JP | [2006/49] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Yamamoto, Masahiro 1103 Seaside Mansion, 26-1 Kamoike-Shinmachi Kagoshima-shi, Kagoshima-ken 890-0064 / JP | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Yamamoto, Masahiko 907, Quality Palace Hachiman, 46-7, Arata 1-chome Kagoshima-shi, Kagoshima 890-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/18] | Des Termes, Monique, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00922983.2 | 08.05.2000 | [2001/18] | WO2000JP02930 | Priority number, date | JP19990126243 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12624399 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067588 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094720 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094720 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/00, A23K1/06, A23K1/10 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
A23K10/26 (EP,US);
A23K10/12 (EP,US);
A23K10/38 (EP,US);
Y02P60/87 (EP,US);
Y10S426/805 (EP,US);
Y10S426/807 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | TIERFUTTER UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2001/18] | English: | ANIMAL FEED AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2001/18] | French: | ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 22.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2006 | BE | 06.12.2006 | CH | 06.12.2006 | CY | 06.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | FI | 06.12.2006 | IT | 06.12.2006 | LI | 06.12.2006 | NL | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.03.2007 | GR | 07.03.2007 | ES | 17.03.2007 | PT | 07.05.2007 | IE | 08.05.2007 | LU | 08.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/25] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
IE | 08.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
SE | 06.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS58190356 ; | [X]JPS6420090 ; | [XY]JPH0775563 ; | [Y]JPH03147750 ; | [X]JPS57174061 ; | [X]JPS62179352 ; | [X]JPH0678686 ; | [X]GB1489592 (THREE BOND CO LTD) [X] 1-5,14 * page 2, line 26 - line 64 * * page 3, line 19 - line 44 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,3,5 *; | [Y]US4298621 (SAMIS JAMES M, et al) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 5 - line 9 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 50, Database accession no. 1983-841854, XP002143774 & JPS58190356 A 19831107 (KATAOKA F) [X] 1-11,14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890511), vol. 013, no. 199, Database accession no. (C - 594), & JP01020090 A 19890124 (MASAHIRO YAMAMOTO) [X] 1-3,5,10,14 * abstract * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 20, Database accession no. 1995-151476, XP002143775 & JPH0775563 A 19950320 (OHISA N) [X] 1,14 * abstract * [Y] 2-5 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 31, Database accession no. 1991-227654, XP002143776 & JPH03147750 A 19910624 (KOJIMA Y) [Y] 2,3,5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 48, Database accession no. 1982-03717J, XP002143777 & JPS57174061 A 19821026 (CHIHARA T) [X] 1,14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880127), vol. 012, no. 028, Database accession no. (C - 471), & JP62179352 A 19870806 (SHUZO NAKAZONO;OTHERS: 03) [X] 1,14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940624), vol. 018, no. 334, Database accession no. (C - 1216), & JP06078686 A 19940322 (KAGAWA PREF GOV;OTHERS: 02) [X] 1,14 * abstract * |