EP1181032 - SYSTEM FOR EXSANGUINOUS METABOLIC SUPPORT OF AN ORGAN OR TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Breonics, Inc. W.A. Harriman Campus Drive Building 7A, Suite 310 Albany, NY 12206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Breonics, Inc. 301 Nott Street Schenectady, NY 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRASILE, Lauren 61 Meadow Lane Albany, NY 12208 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00923303.2 | 13.04.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000US09894 | Priority number, date | US19990129257P | 14.04.1999 Original published format: US 129257 P | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0061166 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181032 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K31/70, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, A01N1/02 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
A01N1/0247 (EP);
A01N1/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/09] | A61K38/00, A61K31/70, C12N5/00, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR EXSANGUINÄRE METABOLISCHE UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES ORGANS ODER GEWEBES | [2002/09] | English: | SYSTEM FOR EXSANGUINOUS METABOLIC SUPPORT OF AN ORGAN OR TISSUE | [2002/09] | French: | SYSTEME SUPPORT METABOLIQUE EXSANGUINE D'UN ORGANE OU TISSU | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 21.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5843024 (BRASILE LAUREN [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 7, line 41 - line 62 *; | [X]US5699793 (BRASILE LAUREN [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 8, line 25 - line 49 *; | [X]US5338662 (SADRI FEREYDOON [US]) [X] 1-15,17-22 * column 6, line 13 - column 8, line 66; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 3-45 *; | [X]EP0376763 (MCKELVEY KAREN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9531897 (VEC TEC INC [US]) [X] 16 * page 9, line 12 - line 33 * * page 10, lines 12-16 *; | [X]WO9531944 (VEC TEC INC [US]) [X] 17,19,20,22 * page 11, lines 22-33 * * page 15, line 15 - page 18, line 34 * * page 27, lines 11-34 * * page 4, lines 10,11 *; | [Y]US5599659 (BRASILE LAUREN [US], et al) [Y] 24-30 * abstract * * column 9, lines 4-46; table 2 * * column 11, lines 1-56 *; | [Y]US5702881 (BRASILE LAUREN [US], et al) [Y] 24-30 * abstract * * column 6, lines 1-23; table I * * column 8, lines 30-40 *; | [X] - DE ROOS W K ET AL, "Isolated-organ perfusion for local gene delivery: Efficient adenovirus-mediated gene transfer into the liver", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1997), Database accession no. PREV199799409497, XP002285466 [X] 18,23 * abstract * | [ ] - GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 55 - 62 | [X] - BACIEWICZ F A JR ET AL, "PHARMACOKINETICS AND TOXICITY OF ISOLATED PERFUSION OF LUNG WITH DOXORUBICIN", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1991), Database accession no. PREV199191087164, XP002285467 [X] 18,21 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF SURGICAL RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 50, no. 2, ISSN 0022-4804, pages 124 - 128 | [A] - MEIJER D K F ET AL, "Isolated perfused liver as a tool to study the disposition of peptides, liver first-pass effects, and cell-specific drug delivery", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970505), vol. 46, no. 1-2, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 139 - 156, XP004096319 [A] 17-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(96)01587-8 | [A] - D'ALESSANDRO A M ET AL, "Organ preservation", PROBLEMS IN GENERAL SURGERY 1998 UNITED STATES, (1998), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0739-8328, pages 10 - 20, XP009032447 [A] 31 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9300808 ; | [Y]US5747469 ; | [Y]US5484789 ; | [X] - HASSANEIN ET. AL., "Continuous perfusion of donor hearts in the beating state extends preservation time and improves recovery of function", JOURNAL OF THORACIC AND CARDIOVASCULAR SURGERY, (199811), vol. 116, no. 5, pages 821 - 830, XP002929772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5223(98)00452-8 | [X] - LAKEY ET. AL., "Development of an automated computer-controlled islet isolation system", CELL TRANSPLANTATION, (1997), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 47 - 57, XP002929773 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0963-6897(96)00137-6 | [X] - NAKAMURA ET. AL., "Ex vivo liver perfusion with arterial blood from a pig with ischemic liver failure", ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, (199902), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 153 - 160, XP002929774 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1525-1594.1999.06131.x | [X] - DUTKOWSKI ET. AL., "Rat liver preservation by hypothermic ascillating liver perfusion compared to simple cold storage", CRYOBIOLOGY, (199802), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 61 - 70, XP002929775 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cryo.1997.2066 | [Y] - ESCHWEGE ET. AL., "Subzero nonfrozen storage of rat kidneys and livers: Computer-assisted organ perfusion-storage equipment", TRANPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, (199610), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 2900 - 2902, XP002929776 | [Y] - FLAX ET. AL., "Analogue computer model of a kidney during preservation", MED. BIOL. CHEM. COMPUT., (1979), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 199 - 206, XP002929777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02440929 | [Y] - ADEM ET. AL., "Computer control of a modified Langendorff perfusion apparatus for organ preservation using cryoprotective agents", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (198104), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 285 - 292, XP002929778 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-5425(81)90006-6 | [Y] - VAHL ET. AL., "Heterogeneity of myocardial edema in isolated pig hearts after perfusion with different types of cardioprotective solutions", THORACIC AND CARDIOVASCULAR SURGEON, (199810), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 285 - 292, XP002929779 | [A] - CHEN ET. AL., "Clinical experience with a porcine hepatocyte-based liver support system", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, (199611), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 664 - 669, XP002929780 | [A] - FAHY ET. AL., "Cryopreservation of the mammalian kidney II Demonstration of immediate ex vivo function after introduction and removal of 7.5 M cryoprotectant", CRYOBIOLOGY, (199709), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 114 - 131, XP002929781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cryo.1997.2026 |