|
17.02.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.03.2012 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.12.2011 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
51 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.08.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
35 |