|
20.09.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
127 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
99 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Description |
Opposition |
99 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
01.08.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.11.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.08.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.07.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
86 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
61 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
85 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
148 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
68 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
133 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Letter concerning publication issues |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
133 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Letter concerning publication issues |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
147 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
158 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
117 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2006 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
159 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
24.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2002 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
106 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
161 |
|
08.06.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.06.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
08.06.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
127 |
|
08.06.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
26 |