|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
16 |
|
14.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
32 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
23.03.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.03.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.03.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.03.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.03.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
10.03.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.11.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
63 |