|
30.03.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
01.03.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2016 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.08.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2012 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.02.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
20 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
18 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Opposition |
20 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
19 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Deficiencies concerning the deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.06.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.06.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.06.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.06.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.11.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
28 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |