EP1183146 - IMPROVED GRIPPERS FOR HANDLING PREFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIPA S.p.A. via Caduti del Lavoro, 3 I-31029 Vittorio Veneto / IT | [2002/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOPPAS, Matteo Via Silvio Pellico, 54 I-33074 Fontanafredda / IT | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Giugni, Valter, et al PROPRIA S.r.l., Via Mazzini 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | ||
Former [2002/10] | Busca, Luciano, et al PROPRIA Protezione Proprietà Industriale srl Via Mazzini 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 00929417.4 | 25.04.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000EP03679 | Priority number, date | IT1999PN00023U | 09.06.1999 Original published format: IT PN990023 U | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076746 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183146 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183146 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/42, B25J15/02, B23Q7/04 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B25J15/0206 (EP,US);
B29C49/4205 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/42075 (EP);
B29C49/42087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/48] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER GREIFER ZUM HANDHABEN VON VORFORMLINGEN | [2002/10] | English: | IMPROVED GRIPPERS FOR HANDLING PREFORMS | [2002/10] | French: | PINCES DE PREHENSION AMELIOREES POUR LA MANIPULATION DE PREFORMES | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2720679 (SIDEL SA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,6,8 * abstract * * page 7, line 5 - line 36 * [A] 3-5; | [YA]DE29713510U (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6,8 * figures 2,3 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 20 *[A] 3-5 |