EP1192069 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING TRACTION SLIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2007/15] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLL, Georg Hegelstrasse 2 D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE | 02 /
HALLER, Frank Clementineweg 12 D-60385 Frankfurt / DE | [2002/14] | Application number, filing date | 00935206.3 | 13.06.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000EP05428 | Priority number, date | DE1999127660 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19927660 | DE2000127628 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10027628 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0078584 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192069 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1192069 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00, B60K28/16 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60K28/16 (EP);
B60T8/175 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/02 (EP,US);
B60W30/18172 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
B60T2220/02 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DES ANTRIEBSSCHLUPFES | [2002/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING TRACTION SLIP | [2002/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION ANTIPATINAGE | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3634240 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,19-21 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 8; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3914364 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2,19-21 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 21; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0498174 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,19-21 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 19; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4236004 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,19-21* column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 11; figure 1 * |