|
31.05.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.06.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.08.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.09.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.09.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.09.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.09.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.09.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.09.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.12.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.12.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |