|
02.06.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Description |
Opposition |
23 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
38 |
|
29.09.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Annex |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.10.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
15.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.07.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
50 |