EP1192254 - HELICAL POLYPEPTIDE ZALPHA29 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | [2002/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONKLIN, Darrell, C. 117 East Louisa Street 421 Seattle, WA 98102 / US | 02 /
GAO, Zeren 9502 179th Place Northeast 3 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00941509.2 | 16.06.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000US16736 | Priority number, date | US19990343163 | 28.06.1999 Original published format: US 343163 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100831 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192254 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/19, C07K14/52, C07K16/24, G01N33/68 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HELIX POLYPEPTIDE ZALPHA29 | [2002/14] | English: | HELICAL POLYPEPTIDE ZALPHA29 | [2002/14] | French: | POLYPEPTIDE SPIRALE ZALPHA29 | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]WO9953051 (DUCLERT AYMERIC ;GENSET (FR); DUMAS MILNE EDWARDS JEAN BAPTI (FR);) [PA] 1-16 * Sequence ID no.1033 page 503 and the claims * * 98,3% identity in 60 aa overlap with sequence ID no.2 * | [A] - B.J.A. VAN DE SLUIS ET AL, "hypothetical 7.4 KDa protein (fragment)", SWALL, (19990501), XP002150775 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [ ] - B.J.A. VAN DE SLUIS ET AL, "genetic mapping of the copper toxicosis locus in bedlington terriers to dog chromosome 10, in a region syntenic to human chromosome region 2p13-p16", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (199903), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 501 - 507, XP000953031 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/8.3.501 | [A] - A. NABETANI ET AL, "The mouse U2af1-rs1 is a neomorphic imprinted gene", EMBL, XP002150776 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [ ] - MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199702), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 789 - 798, XP002150774 | [A] - L. HILLIER ET AL, "WashU-Merck EST project 1997", EMBL, (19970605), XP002150777 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [ ] - UNPUBLISHED |