EP1180010 - ANTIPERSPIRANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2002/44] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
LI
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2002/08] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emslie, Bruce Steven Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
STOIMENOF, Laura Dimitrova 36 Chandos Road East Finchley, London N2 9AP / GB | 03 /
TURNER, Graham Andrew Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral, MerseysideCH63 3JW / GB | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Timothy, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [2008/28] |
Former [2006/03] | Pearce, Timothy, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/08] | Pearce, Timothy Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00942011.8 | 02.06.2000 | [2002/08] | WO2000EP05106 | Priority number, date | GB19990012924 | 03.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9912924 | GB20000011084 | 08.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0011084 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0074640 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180010 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/32 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTITRANSPIRANT ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2002/08] | English: | ANTIPERSPIRANT COMPOSITIONS | [2002/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ANTISUDORIFIQUES | [2002/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2009 | 29.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/14] | 29.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5885559 (LEE WILSON [US], et al) [X] 1-12,25 * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 16; claims 1,2 * [A] 13-24,26-36; | [XA]US5281413 (ABRUTYN ERIC S [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * claims 1,10-13 * [A] 13-36; | [X]DE19643238 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1,13-36 * claims 1-10 * | Examination | US5102656 | - "BIENENWACHS", Otte, I., Wörterbuch der Kosmetik, Stuttgart, Wissenschaftliche Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, (1985), page 36, ISBN 3-8047-0733-5 | - "Beeswax", The Merck Index, n°1049 |