|
29.07.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2004 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |