EP1194541 - NON-LACTATE-ASSIMILATING YEAST FOR IMPROVING AEROBIC STABILITY OF SILAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, IA 50309 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, IA 50309 / US | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendrick, Carol A. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Johnston, IA 50131-1000 / US | 02 /
Platt, Nancy J. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Johnston, IA 50131-1000 / US | 03 /
Ruser, Barbara G. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Johnston, IA 50131-1000 / US | 04 /
Hoganson, Dean A. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Johnston, IA 50131-1000 / US | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Irvine, Jonquil Claire J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Irvine, Jonquil Claire J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00945281.4 | 07.07.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000US18744 | Priority number, date | US19990350710 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350710 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104291 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194541 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1194541 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12R1/85, A23K1/00, A23K3/03, C12Q1/68 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/11 (EP,US);
C12N1/185 (EP,US);
A23K10/18 (EP,US);
A23K30/18 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6895 (EP,US);
C12R2001/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HEFEN DIE KEIN LAKTAT ASSIMILIEREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER AEROBEN STABILITÄT VON SILAGE | [2003/42] | English: | NON-LACTATE-ASSIMILATING YEAST FOR IMPROVING AEROBIC STABILITY OF SILAGE | [2002/15] | French: | LEVURE D'ASSIMILATION SANS LACTATE POUR AMELIORER LA STABILITE AEROBIE DE L'ENSILAGE | [2002/15] |
Former [2002/15] | VERWENDUNG VON HEFE DIE KEIN LAKTAT ASSIMILIEREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER AEROBEN STABILITÄT VON SILAGE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2004 | BE | 19.05.2004 | CH | 19.05.2004 | CY | 19.05.2004 | ES | 19.05.2004 | FI | 19.05.2004 | LI | 19.05.2004 | IE | 07.07.2004 | LU | 07.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | DK | 19.08.2004 | GR | 19.08.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | PT | 19.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
BE | 19.05.2004 | ||
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
CY | 19.05.2004 | ||
ES | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
LU | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
BE | 19.05.2004 | ||
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
LU | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
BE | 19.05.2004 | ||
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
BE | 19.05.2004 | ||
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
BE | 19.05.2004 | ||
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
BE | 19.05.2004 | ||
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1042861 ; | [A]JPS63222660 ; | [A]WO9729644 (BIOTAL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,9,10,15,19-23 * the whole document *; | [A] - KITAMOTO H K ET AL., "Selection of killer yeasts (Kluyveromyces lactis) to prevent aerobic deterioration in silage making", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, (199303), vol. 76, no. 3, pages 803 - 811, XP000356261 [A] 1,9,10,15,19-23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 17, Database accession no. 1998-186860, XP002154353 & JPH1042861 A 19980217 (NORINSUISANSHO KUSACHI SHIKENJOCHO) [A] 1,9,10,15,19-23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 43, Database accession no. 1988-303570, XP002154354 & JPS63222660 A 19880916 (NAKAMURA K) [A] 1,9,10,15,19-23 * abstract * | [AD] - WEINBERG, Z.G. ET AL, "New trends and opportunities in the development and use of inoculants for silage", FEMS MICROBIOL. REV., (1996), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 53 - 68, XP000960647 [AD] 1,9,10,15,19-23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-6445(96)00025-3 | [A] - JAMES S A ET AL., "S. exiguus 18S rRNA gene", EMBL, EMBL, (19970522), XP002154352 [A] 27,28 * the whole document * | [A] - JAMES S A ET AL., "A phylogenetic analysis of the genus Saccharomyces based on 18S rRNA gene sequences: description of Saccharomyces kunashirensis sp. nov. and Saccharomyces martiniae sp. nov.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SYSTEMATIC BACTERIOLOGY, (199704), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 453 - 460, XP000960707 [A] 27,28 * abstract * | [A] - MAGLIANI W ET AL., "Yeast killer systems", CLNICAL MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, (199707), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 369 - 400, XP002154351 [A] 1 * pages 369-380; table 1 * | [A] - FLEET G, "Spoilage yeasts", CRC CRITICAL REVIEWS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 12, no. 1/2, pages 1 - 44, XP000965114 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 14, column L, line 35 - column R, line 15 * |